Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agapitus Enuyehnyoh Nfon

Bishop of Kumba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1964 BornShishong
22 Mar 199127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kumbo, Cameroon
8 Apr 201147.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamenda, Cameroon
8 Apr 201147.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Unizibira
31 May 201147.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Unizibira
15 Mar 201652.0AppointedBishop of Kumba, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Agapitus Enuyehnyoh Nfon
Bishop Agapitus Enuyehnyoh Nfon (born ) Bishop of Kumba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kumba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2011
  • ob: CB, 18 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,066
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016