Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Nkuo

Bishop of Kumbo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1953 BornNjiniikom
26 Apr 198128.2Ordained PriestPriest of Buéa, Cameroon
8 Jul 200653.4AppointedBishop of Kumbo, Cameroon
8 Sep 200653.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kumbo, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for George Nkuo:
Bishop George Nkuo (born ) Bishop of Kumbo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kumbo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013