Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pius Suh Awa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Buéa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1930BornBamenda
21 Dec 196131.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 197140.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Buéa, Cameroon
20 Feb 197140.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzegera
30 May 197141.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzegera
29 Jan 197342.7SucceededBishop of Buéa, Cameroon
30 Nov 200676.6RetiredBishop of Buéa, Cameroon
9 Feb 201483.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Buéa, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Pius Suh Awa:
Bishop Pius Suh Awa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Buéa

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2006
  • d: CB, 10 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 11 Feb 2014