Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Saburo Hirata, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fukuoka, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1913Born
17 Dec 193825.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Fukuoka, Japan
29 Jun 193925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fukuoka, Japan
1940¹26.4EnteredPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
22 Dec 196148.4AppointedBishop of Oita, Japan
26 Mar 196248.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oita, Japan
15 Nov 196956.3AppointedBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
23 Jan 197056.5InstalledBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
6 Oct 199077.2RetiredBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
5 Aug 200794.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Fukuoka, Japan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Saburo Hirata
Bishop Peter Saburo Hirata P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fukuoka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKitano-Machi
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopOïta, Diocese of Oita

  • a priest for 68.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 24
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2007, Page 260
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast