Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Francis Kelly, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toowoomba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1917BornWellington
12 Mar 194225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
6 Feb 196951.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
6 Feb 196951.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ficus
25 Mar 196952.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ficus
19 Dec 197558.7AppointedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
11 Feb 197658.9InstalledBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
20 Nov 199275.7RetiredBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
2 Sep 199477.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Toowoomba, Australia

MicroData Summary for Edward Francis Kelly:
Bishop Edward Francis Kelly M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toowoomba

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014