Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Rosso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo

Titular Bishop of Myndus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1885BornValmala
19 Dec 190823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saluzzo, Italy
14 Nov 193449.4AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
3 Feb 193549.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cuneo, Italy
10 Mar 193549.7InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
6 Jan 195771.5ResignedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
6 Jan 195771.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
12 Sep 195772.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Rosso:
Bishop Giacomo Rosso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013