Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Quirico Travaini

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy

Bishop of Cuneo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1866Born
9 Jul 189327.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 191952.5AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
1 Jun 191952.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
Oct 1924³58.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cuneo, Italy
21 Jun 192660.0AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
19 Mar 193467.7DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Quirico Travaini
Bishop Quirico Travaini (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaggiate Superiore di Gattico

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 25 Mar 2018