Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal Bernardo Mejía Corral

Bishop of Chulucanas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1954 Born
18 Dec 198935.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
14 Dec 199642.0IncardinatedPriest of Lurín, Peru
2 Apr 202065.3AppointedBishop of Chulucanas, Peru
15 Nov 202065.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chulucanas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Bernardo Mejía Corral
Bishop Cristóbal Bernardo Mejía Corral (born ) Bishop of Chulucanas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarhuaz, Ancash, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopOutdoors, near, Cathedral, Chulucanas, Diocese of Chulucanas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chulucanas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2020
  • c1: CB, 3 Apr 2020
  • ob: CB, 2 Oct 2020
  • c2+: CB, 15 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast