Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Abissa Kwaku

Deceased

Bishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1927Born
20 Dec 195629.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 196336.6AppointedBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
24 Nov 196336.8Ordained BishopBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
10 Aug 197851.6DiedBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Eugène Abissa Kwaku
Bishop Eugène Abissa Kwaku (born 1927, died ) Bishop of Abengourou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoun-Abronso

  • a priest for 21.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast