Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Francis Kupfer, M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Taichung, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1909Born
1928²18.9ProfessedMember of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
11 Jun 193324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
26 Jan 195141.9AppointedPrefect of Taichung, Taiwan
16 Apr 196253.2AppointedBishop of Taichung, Taiwan
25 Jul 196253.4Ordained BishopBishop of Taichung, Taiwan
25 Jun 198677.4RetiredBishop of Taichung, Taiwan
2 Jan 199888.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Taichung, Taiwan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Francis Kupfer
Bishop William Francis Kupfer M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Taichung

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, NY, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York, USA
Ordained BishopMaryknoll, USA
Death PlaceValhalla, NY

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,962, Number 104
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 13 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast