Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Henry Conroy

Deceased

Bishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1858Born
11 Jun 188122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
11 Mar 191253.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
11 Mar 191253.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
1 May 191253.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
21 Nov 192163.0AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
20 Mar 193980.3DiedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Henry Conroy (VIAF: 315946962)
Bishop Joseph Henry Conroy (born , died ) Bishop of Ogdensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWatertown, NY

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,912, Number 32
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast