Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gérard Denis Auguste Defois

Bishop Emeritus of Lille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1931 Born
11 Oct 195625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
26 Jul 199059.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
6 Oct 199059.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
21 Dec 199059.9SucceededArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
4 Sep 199564.6AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
2 Jul 199867.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lille, France
1 Feb 200877.0RetiredBishop of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Gérard Denis Auguste Defois
Archbishop Gérard Denis Auguste Defois (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNueil-sur-Layon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lille.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,082
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018