Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Célestin-Henri Joussard, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Grouard, Alberta, Canada

Titular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1851Born
8 Dec 187625.1ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 Apr 188028.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 May 190957.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Athabaska, Alberta, Canada
11 May 190957.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
5 Sep 190957.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
18 Apr 192977.5RetiredCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Grouard, Alberta, Canada
20 Sep 193280.9DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Grouard, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Célestin-Henri Joussard
Bishop Célestin-Henri Joussard O.M.I. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Grouard

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Michel-de-Saint-Geoirs, France

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 64
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018