Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Signay

Deceased

Archbishop of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1778BornQuébec
28 Mar 180223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
15 Dec 182648.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Québec, Canada
15 Dec 182648.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Fussala
20 May 182748.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Fussala
14 Feb 183354.3SucceededArchbishop of Québec, Canada
3 Oct 185071.9DiedArchbishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Signay:
Archbishop Joseph Signay (born , died ) Archbishop of Québec

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 200, and Page 316

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013