Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvester Tung Kiem San

Bishop of Denpasar, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1961 Born
29 Jul 198827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ende, Indonesia
22 Nov 200847.3AppointedBishop of Denpasar, Indonesia
19 Feb 200947.6Ordained BishopBishop of Denpasar, Indonesia
11 Oct 201756.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ruteng, Indonesia
19 Mar 202058.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ruteng, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Silvester Tung Kiem San (VIAF: 311413677)
Bishop Silvester Tung Kiem San (born ) Bishop of Denpasar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaupongo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Denpasar, Diocese of Denpasar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Denpasar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,054
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast