Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardus Sangsun, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ruteng, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1943Born
12 Jul 197229.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
3 Dec 198441.4AppointedBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia
25 Mar 198541.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia
13 Oct 200865.3DiedBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Eduardus Sangsun
Bishop Eduardus Sangsun S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Ruteng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarot

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Jul 2018

Quantcast