Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Darius Nggawa, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Larantuka, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1929Born
12 Oct 195526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
28 Feb 197444.8AppointedBishop of Larantuka, Indonesia
16 Jun 197445.1Ordained BishopBishop of Larantuka, Indonesia
16 Jun 200475.1RetiredBishop of Larantuka, Indonesia
9 Jan 200878.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Larantuka, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Darius Nggawa
Bishop Darius Nggawa S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Larantuka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNggela
Ordained BishopLazantuka

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,072

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast