Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Torquato Dini

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Dara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1893Born
12 Nov 193340.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dara
12 Nov 193340.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
6 Jan 193440.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Dara
26 Mar 193440.7DiedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Torquato Dini
Archbishop Torquato Dini (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Egypt, Arab Republic of

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Angelo in Vado

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast