Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique-Marie Ðnh Ðức Trụ

Deceased

Bishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1909Born
23 May 193828.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 196050.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thi Binh, Viet Nam
5 Mar 196050.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cataquas
25 Mar 196050.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cataquas
24 Nov 196051.1AppointedBishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam
7 Jun 198272.6DiedBishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Marie Ðnh Ðức Trụ
Bishop Dominique-Marie Ðnh Ðức Trụ (born , died ) Bishop of Thi Bnh

EventPlace
Birth PlacePh Nhai
Ordained BishopHa Noi

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1960, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,442

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast