Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augstín Barrere, F.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tucumán, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1865Born
28 Mar 189125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fils de Marie Immaculée
16 Jan 193064.4AppointedBishop of Tucumán, Argentina
3 Aug 193064.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tucumán, Argentina
29 Feb 195286.5DiedBishop of Tucumán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Augstín Barrere
Bishop Augstín Barrere F.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Tucumán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmen de las Flores

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018