Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Peira

Deceased

Bishop of Catamarca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1884Born
20 Dec 190925.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Oct 193248.4AppointedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
21 Dec 193248.5Ordained BishopBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
11 Mar 193449.8DiedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Vicente Peira
Bishop Vicente Peira (born , died ) Bishop of Catamarca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChivilcoy

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast