Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emiel-Jozef De Smedt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1909BornOpwijk
29 Sep 193323.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 195040.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
16 May 195040.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
29 Jun 195040.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elusa
31 Jul 195242.8AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
15 Dec 198475.1RetiredBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
29 Sep 199585.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Emiel-Jozef De Smedt:
Bishop Emiel-Jozef De Smedt (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013