Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph-Léon Cardinal Cardijn

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1882Born
22 Sep 190623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
15 Feb 196582.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tusuros
21 Feb 196582.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tusuros
22 Feb 196582.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 196582.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo
25 Jul 196784.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Léon Cardijn
Joseph-Léon Cardinal Cardijn (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchaerbeek-Brussels, Belgium

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • ob: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast