Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Constant Schoenmaekers

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Titular Bishop of Acarassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1914BornAntwerpen
18 Apr 193823.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 195237.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
8 Sep 195237.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acarassus
26 Oct 195238.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acarassus
8 Jan 198671.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Paul Constant Schoenmaekers:
Bishop Paul Constant Schoenmaekers (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013