Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johan Jozef Bonny

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1955 Born
20 Jul 198025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
28 Oct 200853.2AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium
4 Jan 200953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Johan Jozef Bonny
Bishop Johan Jozef Bonny (born ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOostende

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2008
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,042

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 3 Sep 2018

Quantcast