Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Antônio de Conto

Bishop of Montenegro, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1942 BornEncantado
13 Jul 196825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
24 Jul 199148.8AppointedBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
15 Sep 199148.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
27 May 199855.6AppointedBishop of Criciúma, Santa Catarina, Brazil
2 Jul 200865.7AppointedBishop of Montenegro, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Antônio de Conto:
Bishop Paulo Antônio de Conto (born ) Bishop of Montenegro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Montenegro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,470

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013