Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onécimo Alberton

Bishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1965 BornBrusque do Sul
31 May 199227.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
27 Sep 199227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
27 May 199833.2IncardinatedPriest of Criciúma, Santa Catarina, Brazil
17 Dec 201449.8AppointedBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
22 Feb 201550.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
15 Mar 201550.0InstalledBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Onécimo Alberton:
Bishop Onécimo Alberton (born ) Bishop of Rio do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rio do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2014
  • ob/i/c1: CB, 17 Dec 2014
  • ob/i: CB, 7 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 8 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015