Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres

Dioecesis Sancti Aloisii de Caceres



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antônio Emidio Vilar, S.D.B., Bishop
  • José Vieira de Lima, T.O.R., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 5 April 1910
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cuiabá
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Mato Grosso
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 100,000 (38,625 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Oeste II
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Praca Barao do Rio Branco 296, C.P. 250, 78200-000 Caceres, MT, Brazil
  • Telephone: (065)3223-1788
  • Fax: 3223-1899

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
5 April 1910ErectedArchdiocese of Cuiabá Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres (erected)
1 May 1925Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas
Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho (erected)
1 March 1929Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Porto Velho
Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres
Territorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195042,00047,30088.8%1785,2507154ap1951
1966100,000105,00095.2%17812,50011334ap1967
1970125,000130,00096.2%18913,88814334ap1971
1976176,000195,00090.3%671313,53812529ap1977
1980176,000198,00088.9%961511,73312799ap1981
1990233,000254,00091.7%205259,320109216ap1991
1999314,000400,00078.5%1992811,214165018ap2000
2000318,000415,00076.6%1982711,777154718ap2001
2001318,000415,00076.6%17102711,777184718ap2002
2002316,000400,00079.0%20103010,533184718ap2003
2003317,000400,00079.3%1892711,7401174718ap2004
2004318,000400,00079.5%19102910,965164719ap2005
2010334,000428,00078.0%2712398,564185021ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 1 Jun 2013