Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Rômulo Gonçalves e Silva

Bishop of Montenegro, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1969 Born
8 Dec 199425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
22 Mar 201748.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montenegro, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
4 Jun 201748.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Montenegro, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
9 Jun 201748.3InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Montenegro, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 Oct 201748.7SucceededBishop of Montenegro, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Rômulo Gonçalves e Silva (VIAF: 306474321)
Bishop Carlos Rômulo Gonçalves e Silva (born ) Bishop of Montenegro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiratini, Diocese of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopSão Francisco de Paula, Cathedral, Pelotas, Archdiocese of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Montenegro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 24 Mar 2017
  • c2+: CB, 15 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,440
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast