Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás de Carlo

Deceased

Bishop of Resistencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1882BornPietraroia, Italy
18 Mar 190522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paraná, Argentina
2 Aug 191835.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraná, Argentina
2 Aug 191835.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Palaestina
30 Mar 191936.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Palaestina
20 Dec 193654.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
1 Aug 194057.9AppointedBishop of Resistencia, Argentina
19 Oct 194058.1InstalledBishop of Resistencia, Argentina
19 Oct 195169.1DiedBishop of Resistencia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Nicolás de Carlo:
Bishop Nicolás de Carlo (born , died ) Bishop of Resistencia

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013