Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Canale Oberti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe

Titular Bishop of Arindela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1869BornBuenos Aires
23 Dec 189324.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 192152.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
25 Nov 192152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
2 Jul 192253.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
15 Nov 195687.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Rafael Canale Oberti:
Bishop Rafael Canale Oberti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015