Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Echenique Altamira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tucumán

Titular Bishop of Thennesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1869BornCórdoba
19 Nov 189122.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 191445.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tucumán, Argentina
10 Dec 191445.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thennesus
4 Jul 191546.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thennesus
27 Nov 192253.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tucumán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Echenique Altamira:
Bishop Carlos Echenique Altamira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tucumán

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013