Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Anselmo Luque

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Titular Bishop of Furnos Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1856Born
18 Sep 188125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
25 May 191458.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
25 May 191458.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
28 Oct 191458.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
5 Apr 193073.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Anselmo Luque
Bishop José Anselmo Luque (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla del Rosario

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast