Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abel Juan Bazán y Bustos

Deceased

Bishop of Paraná, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1867Born
19 Dec 189124.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 191042.4AppointedBishop of Paraná, Argentina
8 May 191042.6Ordained BishopBishop of Paraná, Argentina
15 May 191042.7InstalledBishop of Paraná, Argentina
25 Apr 192658.6DiedBishop of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Abel Juan Bazán y Bustos
Bishop Abel Juan Bazán y Bustos (born , died ) Bishop of Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTama

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast