Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Vicentín

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Corrientes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1895BornAvellaneda
21 Dec 191823.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 193439.4AppointedBishop of Corrientes, Argentina
25 Feb 193539.9Ordained BishopBishop of Corrientes, Argentina
7 Mar 193539.9InstalledBishop of Corrientes, Argentina
10 Apr 196166.0AppointedArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
5 Apr 197277.0RetiredArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
15 Apr 198489.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Corrientes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Francisco Vicentín:
Archbishop Francisco Vicentín (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Corrientes

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015