Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Abbo

Bishop of Ngaoundéré


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1969 BornMbe
19 Jun 199929.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon
24 Jun 200030.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon
10 Jan 201545.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon
15 Mar 201646.6AppointedBishop of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon
30 Apr 201646.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Abbo
Bishop Emmanuel Abbo (born ) Bishop of Ngaoundéré

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ngaoundéré.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2016
  • od/c01: CB, 30 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 30 Apr 2016