Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis María Pérez de Onraita Aguirre

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Malanje


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1933BornGauna (Álava), Spain
11 Aug 195724.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 199562.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Malanje, Angola
10 Mar 199662.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Malanje, Angola
27 Aug 199865.3SucceededBishop of Malanje, Angola
12 Apr 201178.0AppointedArchbishop of Malanje, Angola
19 May 201279.1RetiredArchbishop of Malanje, Angola
3 Apr 201581.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Malanje, Angola

MicroData Summary for Luis María Pérez de Onraita Aguirre:
Archbishop Luis María Pérez de Onraita Aguirre (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Malanje

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2011
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 434
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,710
  • r: Bollettino, 19 May 2012
  • d: CB, 3 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 4 Apr 2015