Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Vilaplana Molina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1926Born
18 Dec 194923.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 197650.5AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
31 Oct 197650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
9 Feb 198760.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
15 Mar 198761.0InstalledBishop of León, Spain
19 Mar 200276.0RetiredBishop of León, Spain
14 Jan 201083.8DiedBishop Emeritus of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vilaplana Molina (VIAF: 2247563)
Bishop Antonio Vilaplana Molina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcoy

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast