Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Djida, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1945Born
5 Dec 197631.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Oct 200055.5AppointedBishop of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon
25 Feb 200155.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon
6 Jan 201569.7DiedBishop of Ngaoundéré, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Joseph Djida
Bishop Joseph Djida O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Ngaoundéré

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMayo-Darlé

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,919
  • d: CB, 6 Jan 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018