Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Maria Oburu Asue, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1947Born
22 Mar 198133.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
8 Mar 200355.9AppointedBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
11 May 200356.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
27 Aug 200659.3DiedBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Alfred Maria Oburu Asue
Bishop Alfred Maria Oburu Asue C.M.F. (born , died ) Bishop of Ebebiyin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEvinayong

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,374
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast