Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carloto Fernandes da Silva Távora

Deceased

Bishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1863BornJaguaribe Mirim
7 Jun 189935.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 191956.0AppointedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Jan 192056.1Ordained BishopBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
29 Nov 193369.9DiedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carloto Fernandes da Silva Távora:
Bishop Carloto Fernandes da Silva Távora (born , died ) Bishop of Caratinga

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013