Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Guaxupé

Dioecesis Guaxupensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3 February 1916
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 13,953 (5,389 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Official Web Site: http://guaxupe.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Francisco Ribeiro do Valle 242, 37800-000 Guaxupe, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (035)3551-1013
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 February 1916ErectedDiocese of Pouso Alegre Diocese of Guaxupé (erected)
11 May 1968Territory LostDiocese of Guaxupé Territorial Abbey of Claraval (erected)
11 December 2002Territory AddedTerritorial Abbey of Claraval (suppressed) Diocese of Guaxupé

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950572,000575,00099.5%4837856,7297821549ap1951
1966523,400537,00097.5%5341945,5686139256ap1967
1970417,093453,06892.1%72371093,8266938757ap1971
1976398,204477,15583.5%5323765,23914724456ap1977
1980348,000478,87472.7%5124754,64024722859ap1981
1990583,000689,00084.6%5414688,57312519460ap1991
1999556,613755,64173.7%6819876,39712816670ap2000
2000556,613755,64173.7%7419935,98513315473ap2001
2001596,226805,71174.0%6419837,18312812972ap2002
2002597,029805,71174.1%6419837,19312812973ap2003
2003597,029805,71174.1%6819876,8628316573ap2004
2004572,711818,15970.0%7711886,5082014375ap2005
2006608,000867,00070.1%7818966,3334612081ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013