Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prudencio Gomes da Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Goiás, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1868Born
24 Apr 189223.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 190839.5AppointedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
3 May 190839.7Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Brazil
19 Sep 192153.1DiedBishop of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Prudencio Gomes da Silva
Bishop Prudencio Gomes da Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Goiás

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItabira do Mato Dentro

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast