Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octávio Augusto Chagas de Miranda

Deceased

Bishop of Pouso Alegre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1881BornCampinas
20 Dec 190322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Campinas, Brazil
14 Feb 191634.5AppointedBishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
4 Jun 191634.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
29 Jun 191634.9InstalledBishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
29 Oct 195978.2DiedBishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Octávio Augusto Chagas de Miranda:
Bishop Octávio Augusto Chagas de Miranda (born , died ) Bishop of Pouso Alegre

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013