Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lafayette Libânio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1886Born
25 Dec 190923.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 193043.8AppointedBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Dec 193044.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 Jan 193144.3InstalledBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Nov 196680.0RetiredBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Nov 196680.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
14 Dec 197084.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
28 Jul 197992.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Lafayette Libânio
Bishop Lafayette Libânio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rio Preto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePouso Alegre

  • a priest for 69.5 years
  • a bishop for 48.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast