Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nándor Rott

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1869Born
28 Oct 189626.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 191747.5AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
23 Sep 191747.7Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
3 Mar 193969.1DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Nándor Rott
Bishop Nándor Rott (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBodenstadt
Ordained BishopReg. Univ. Scientiar., Church, Budapest

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1917, Number 43
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast