Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-François-Bienaimé-Amedée Lefèvre, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rabat, Morocco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1890Born
28 Jul 191323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Apr 194756.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rabat, Morocco
10 Apr 194756.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Eguga
1 Jun 194756.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eguga
14 Sep 195565.1AppointedArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco
15 Jan 196877.5DiedArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco

MicroData Summary for Louis-François-Bienaimé-Amedée Lefèvre (VIAF: 2463235)
Archbishop Louis-François-Bienaimé-Amedée Lefèvre O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Rabat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCherbourg, France
Death PlaceRabat, Archdiocese of Rabat

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Apr 2020

Quantcast