Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Cloutier

Deceased

Bishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1848Born
22 Sep 187223.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 189950.5AppointedBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
25 Jul 189950.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
18 Sep 193485.8DiedBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Cloutier (VIAF: 89733095)
Bishop François-Xavier Cloutier (born , died ) Bishop of Trois Rivières

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Geneviève de Batiscan
Ordained BishopTrois Rivières, Diocese of Trois Rivières, Québec

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 566
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017