Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Louis André Ouellette

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mont-Laurier, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1913BornSalem, OR
11 Jun 193825.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 195643.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
29 Nov 195643.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
25 Feb 195744.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carrhae
27 Mar 196552.1AppointedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
6 Jun 196552.3InstalledBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
10 May 197865.3ResignedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
11 Oct 200188.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Louis André Ouellette:
Bishop Joseph Louis André Ouellette (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mont-Laurier

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013