Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Ross

Deceased

Bishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1869Born
19 May 189425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec, Canada
11 Dec 192253.7AppointedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
1 May 192354.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
3 May 192354.1InstalledBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
5 Jul 194576.3DiedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Ross
Bishop François-Xavier Ross (born , died ) Bishop of Gaspé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Felicité des Groses Roches
Ordained PriestCathedral, Rimouski, Diocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rimouski, Diocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of), Québec
Buried Place (Original)Urseline, Cemetery, Gaspé, Diocese of Gaspé, Québec
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Gaspé, Diocese of Gaspé, Québec

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,923, Number 23
  • loc: CB, 14 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast